+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 28, 2006 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On June 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On May 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 446.
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Inhofe without amendment. Without written report.
On May 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On April 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor