+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On October 26, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Presented to President.
On October 14, 1999 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 12, 1999 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 800 .
- Mr. Tauzin moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Held at the desk.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 424 - 2 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On September 8, 1999 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On September 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.
On August 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 255.
On August 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator McCain with amendments. With written report No. 106-138 .
- Committee on Commerce. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
On June 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation Subcommittee on Communications. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 106-513.
On May 12, 1999 in the Senate:
On April 14, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor