+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On August 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 263.
- Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator McCain without amendment. With written report No. 106-142 . Additional views filed.
On June 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On June 10, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 106-892.
On April 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On April 14, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor