+ − Actions (12)
On September 22, 1981 in the Senate:
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Committee consideration and Mark Up Session held.
On September 11, 1981 in the Senate:
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Committee consideration and Mark Up Session held.
On July 15, 1981 in the Senate:
- Considered by Subcommittee on Environmental Pollution.
On July 14, 1981 in the Senate:
- Considered by Subcommittee on Environmental Pollution.
On June 24, 1981 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Environmental Pollution. Hearings held.
On June 22, 1981 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Environmental Pollution. Hearings held.
On June 17, 1981 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Environmental Pollution. Hearings held.
On June 15, 1981 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Environmental Pollution. Hearings held.
On June 10, 1981 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Environmental Pollution. Hearings held.
On June 8, 1981 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Environmental Pollution. Hearings held.
On March 24, 1981 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Environmental Pollution.
- Read second time and referred to Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor