+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On December 2, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
On November 17, 2005 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On November 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.
On November 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 272.
On October 27, 2005 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici with amendments. With written report No. 109-171 .
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
On September 28, 2005 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 109-74.
On April 28, 2005 in the Senate:
On April 13, 2005 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor