+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On May 16, 1983 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 172.
- Committee on Labor and Human Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Hatch with amendments. With written report No. 98-110.
On April 13, 1983 in the Senate:
- Committee on Labor and Human Resources. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
On March 23, 1983 in the Senate:
- Committee on Labor and Human Resources requested executive comment from Health and Human Services Department, GAO, OMB.
On March 17, 1983 in the Senate:
- Committee on Labor and Human Resources. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 98-145.
On March 11, 1983 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Labor and Human Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor