+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On June 30, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 106-229.
On June 20, 2000 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On June 16, 2000 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On June 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Senate agreed to conference report by Yea-Nay Vote. 87 - 0.
On June 15, 2000 in the Senate:
- Conference papers: Senate report and manager's statement held at the desk in Senate.
- Conference report considered in Senate.
On June 14, 2000 in the House:
- The previous question was ordered without objection.
- Rule H. Res. 523 passed House.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on the conference report on S. 761 .
- Mr. Bliley brought up conference report H. Rept. 106-661 for consideration under the provisions of H. Res. 523 .
- POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - The Chair put the question on the adoption of the conference report and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Bliley demanded the Yeas and Nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the adoption of the conference report until later in the day.
- Conference papers: message on House action held at the desk in Senate.
- On agreeing to the conference report Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 426 - 4 .
- Motions to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On June 12, 2000 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 523 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of the conference report to S. 761 . All points of order against the conference report and against its consideration are waived. The conference report shall be considered as read.
On June 8, 2000 in the Senate:
- Conference report H. Rept. 106-661 filed.
On May 18, 2000 in the Senate:
- Conference held.
On March 30, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On March 29, 2000 in the House:
- Senate disagreed to House amendments by Unanimous Consent.
On March 29, 2000 in the Senate:
- Senate appointed conferee Hatch, Thurmond and Leahy from the Committee on the Judiciary for consideration of items within their jurisdiction.
- Senate agreed to request for conference. Appointed conferees. McCain, Burns, Stevens, Gorton, Hutchison, Abraham, Hollings, Inouye, Rockefeller, Kerry and Wyden.
- Senate appointed conferee Gramm, Bennett and Sarbanes from the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs for consideration of items within their jurisdiction.
On February 22, 2000 in the House:
- Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill and House requests a conference.
On February 16, 2000 in the House:
- Mr. Bliley asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- The House struck all after the enacting clause and inserted in lieu thereof the provisions of a similar measure H.R. 1714 . Agreed to without objection.
- The Speaker appointed conferees: Bliley, Tauzin, Oxley, Dingell, and Markey.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion that the House insist upon its amendments, and request a conference Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Mr. Bliley asked unanimous consent that the House insist upon its amendments, and request a conference.
On November 22, 1999 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
On November 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.2787 Proposed by Senator Collins for Senator Abraham. To provide a substitute for the bill as reported.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- S.AMDT.2787 Amendment SP 2787 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On October 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On October 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On September 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On July 30, 1999 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 243.
- Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator McCain with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 106-131 .
On July 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On June 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On May 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 106-893.
On April 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On March 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.2787
To provide a substitute for the bill as reported.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor