+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 26, 1992 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 102-307.
- Signed by President.
On June 16, 1992 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On June 9, 1992 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On June 4, 1992 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Senate agreed to the House amendment by Voice Vote.
- Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- H.AMDT.581 On agreeing to the Brooks amendment Agreed to without objection.
- The previous question was ordered on the bill and the amendment, without objection.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on the bill and on the Brooks amendment in the nature of a substitute.
- H.AMDT.581 Amendment in the nature of a substitute offered by Mr. Brooks. Amendment in the nature of a substitute consists of the text of two bills which passed the House previously: H.R. 2372 , concerning fair use and copyright renewal which passed the House November 25, 1991; and H.R. 1612 , to eliminate the library reproduction reporting requirement which passed the House November 18, 1991.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- Mr. Brooks asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
On November 26, 1991 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 26, 1991 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
On November 25, 1991 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
- The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.1445 Amendment SP 1445 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.1445 Proposed by Senator Lieberman for Senator Leahy. To make a technical amendment.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On October 22, 1991 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 278.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 102-194.
On August 1, 1991 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On June 17, 1991 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Patents, Copyrights and Trademarks. Approved for full committee consideration without amendment favorably.
On June 12, 1991 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Patents, Copyrights and Trademarks. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 102-348.
On March 25, 1991 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Patents, Copyrights and Trademarks.
On March 21, 1991 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Amendments (2)
H.AMDT.581
Amendment in the nature of a substitute consists of the text of two bills which passed the House previously:
S.AMDT.1445
To make a technical amendment.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor