+ − Actions (8)
On March 25, 1982 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Criminal Law. Hearings held.
On March 16, 1982 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Criminal Law. Hearings held.
On November 12, 1981 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Criminal Law. Hearings held.
On October 5, 1981 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Criminal Law. Hearings held.
On June 30, 1981 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary received executive comment from Office of U.S. Attorney General.
On May 4, 1981 in the Senate:
- Star Print ordered on S.751 .
On April 7, 1981 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Criminal Law.
On March 19, 1981 in the Senate:
- Read second time and referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor