+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On October 3, 1989 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 101-160. Additional and minority views filed.
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On July 20, 1989 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Constitution. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 101-507.
On May 5, 1989 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Constitution. Approved for full committee consideration without amendment without recommendation.
On April 19, 1989 in the Senate:
On April 11, 1989 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor