+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On September 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On July 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 387.
- Senate passed companion measure H.R. 663 in lieu of this measure by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate incorporated this measure in H.R. 663 as an amendment.
- Read the third time by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.3568 Amendment SA 3568 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.3568 Amendment SA 3568 proposed by Senator Frist for Senator Gregg. To provide for a complete substitute.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On November 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 387.
- Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Gregg with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 108-196 . Additional views filed.
On July 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On March 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.3568
To provide for a complete substitute.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor