+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (33)
On October 22, 1994 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 103-399.
- Signed by President.
On October 18, 1994 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 12, 1994 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 8, 1994 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Senate agreed to the House amendment by Voice Vote.
On October 6, 1994 in the House:
- Message on House action received in Senate and at the desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
On October 5, 1994 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
On October 4, 1994 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Walker objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed until Oct. 5. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Gejdenson moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On October 3, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 430.
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 103-783.
On September 28, 1994 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Native American Affairs Discharged.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 26, 1994 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 12, 1994 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from HHS.
On July 11, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Native American Affairs.
On May 17, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
On May 16, 1994 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
On May 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
On April 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 417.
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Inouye with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 103-253.
On April 13, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On November 3, 1993 in the Senate:
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held n. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 103-460.
On April 1, 1993 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor