+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 30, 1990 in the Senate:
- Referred to the Committee on Agriculture pursuant to the order of September 28, 1990.
- Committee on Finance. Reported to Senate by Senator Bentsen with amendments. With written report No. 101-481.
- Senate Committee on Agriculture discharged. Pursuant to the order of September 28, 1990.
On September 28, 1990 in the Senate:
- Ordered that the Finance Committee be authorized to report, that the Committee on Agriculture be discharged, and that the bill, as reported be then sequentially referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and that the majority leader, after consultation with the Republican leader, be authorized to order the bill discharged from the Committee on Agriculture at any time.
On August 1, 1990 in the Senate:
- Committee on Finance. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
On April 26, 1990 in the Senate:
- Committee on Finance. Hearings concluded. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 101-557.
On November 15, 1989 in the Senate:
- Committee on Finance. Hearings held.
On November 14, 1989 in the Senate:
- Committee on Finance. Hearings held.
On November 9, 1989 in the Senate:
- Committee on Agriculture. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 101-1151.
On September 26, 1989 in the Senate:
- Referred jointly to the Committees on Agriculture; Finance by unanimous consent with instructions that if either committee has not reported the legislation by the close of business November 1, that the Majority Leader, after consultation with the Republican Leader, be authorized to order the bill discharged from either or both of the committees which have failed to report.
On September 20, 1989 in the Senate:
- Star Print ordered Report 101-120.
On September 6, 1989 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 101-120. Additional and minority views filed.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 228.
On August 2, 1989 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On August 1, 1989 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Committee consideration and Mark Up Session held.
On July 27, 1989 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings concluded. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 101-198.
On July 26, 1989 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
On July 14, 1989 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
On July 13, 1989 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
On July 11, 1989 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
On June 2, 1989 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
On June 1, 1989 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
On May 12, 1989 in the Senate:
- Star Print ordered S.712 .
On April 5, 1989 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor