+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On November 13, 2000 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 106-509.
- Signed by President.
On November 3, 2000 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 24, 2000 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 700 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Hansen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On July 14, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Department of the Interior for comments.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
On July 12, 1999 in the House:
- Received in the House.
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On July 1, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.
On June 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 135.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Murkowski with amendments. With written report No. 106-65 .
On May 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Department of the Interior, OMB.
On May 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
On April 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on National Parks, Historic Preservation, and Recreation. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 106-113.
On March 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Parks, Preservation and Recreation.
On March 24, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor