+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 13, 1979 in the Senate:
- Public Law 96-22.
- Signed by President.
On June 5, 1979 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On June 5, 1979 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On June 4, 1979 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On June 4, 1979 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference report.
On May 30, 1979 in the House:
- House agreed to conference report, roll call #174 .
On May 24, 1979 in the Senate:
- Conference report filed in Senate, S. Rept. 96-195.
On May 24, 1979 in the House:
- Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 96-223.
On May 22, 1979 in the House:
- Conference scheduled in House.
On May 21, 1979 in the Senate:
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
On May 21, 1979 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H. R. 1608 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in House.
On May 16, 1979 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
- Measure considered in Senate.
On May 15, 1979 in the Senate:
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On April 27, 1979 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Veterans' Affairs with amendment, S. Rept. 96-100.
On January 15, 1979 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor