+ − Actions (18)
On May 24, 1982 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 97-180.
- Signed by President.
On May 12, 1982 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On May 10, 1982 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on The Judiciary Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On January 4, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Courts, Civil Liberties, and the Administration of Justice.
On December 3, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
On December 1, 1981 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
On November 18, 1981 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 383.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond favorably with amendments. With written report No. 97-274.
On November 10, 1981 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
On October 29, 1981 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Criminal Law. Measure with amendments to full committee.
On June 19, 1981 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Criminal Law. Hearings held.
On March 19, 1981 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Criminal Law.
On March 12, 1981 in the Senate:
- Read second time and referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor