+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 5, 1985 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 143.
On May 20, 1985 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator Danforth with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 99-64.
- Committee on Commerce. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On April 30, 1985 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Merchant Marine. Hearings concluded. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 99-80.
On March 29, 1985 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Merchant Marine. Hearings held.
On March 21, 1985 in the Senate:
On March 18, 1985 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor