+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On October 1, 1996 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 104-220.
- Signed by President.
On September 20, 1996 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On September 17, 1996 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Moorhead moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 437.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 104-800 .
On September 11, 1996 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On July 23, 1996 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 28, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts and Intellectual Property.
On July 11, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On June 30, 1995 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On May 18, 1995 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 112.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Hatch without amendment. Without written report.
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On April 5, 1995 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor