+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On July 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 231.
- Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator McCain without amendment. With written report No. 106-123 .
On June 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On May 20, 1999 in the Senate:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On May 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On March 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor