+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (16)
On October 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 115-71. (TXT | PDF)
- Signed by President.
On October 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On October 3, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7694-7696)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 652.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7694-7698)
- Mr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On September 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Received in the House.
On September 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On September 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5017-5018; text: CR S5017-5018)
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 44.
- Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor