+ − Summary
+ − Actions (26)
On June 19, 1987 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-55.
- Signed by President.
On June 11, 1987 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On June 8, 1987 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 84.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 100-136.
On June 5, 1987 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From Interior.
On June 3, 1987 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands Discharged.
On May 15, 1987 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Interior.
On May 8, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
On April 8, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
- Measure sent to the House.
On April 7, 1987 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On April 1, 1987 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 75.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston without amendment. With written report No. 100-32.
On March 31, 1987 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources received executive comment from Interior Department. Unfavorable.
On March 25, 1987 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On March 5, 1987 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Interior Department.
On March 3, 1987 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks.
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor