+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- Returned to the Calendar.
- Cloture on the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 43.
- S.AMDT.3824 Considered by Senate.
- Considered by Senate.
- Motion by Senator Daschle to reconsider the vote by which cloture was not invoked entered in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
On June 10, 2002 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.3824 Amendment SA 3824 proposed by Senator Hatch. To amend the penalty section to include the possibility of the death penalty.
- S.AMDT.3807 Proposed amendment SA withdrawn in Senate.
- S.AMDT.3807 Considered by Senate.
- Considered by Senate.
On June 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Cloture motion on the bill presented in Senate.
- S.AMDT.3807 Amendment SA 3807 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Biden. To provide reliable officers, technology, education, community prosecutors, and training in our neighborhoods.
On May 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- By Senator Leahy from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 107-147 . Minority views filed.
On July 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 103.
- Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy without amendment. Without written report.
- Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On March 27, 2001 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendments (2)
S.AMDT.3807
To provide reliable officers, technology, education, community prosecutors, and training in our neighborhoods.
S.AMDT.3824
To amend the penalty section to include the possibility of the death penalty.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor