+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 21, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On May 10, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On May 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.3119 Amendment SA 3119 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.3119 Amendment SA 3119 proposed by Senator Grassley. To provide a complete substitute.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On September 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 295.
- Committee on Finance. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 108-157 .
On September 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- Committee on Finance. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.3119
To provide a complete substitute.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor