+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 9, 1995 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources received executive comment from Department of the Interior.
On April 7, 1995 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 65.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 104-42 .
On March 29, 1995 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On March 24, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Parks, Preservation and Recreation.
On March 23, 1995 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor