+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 21, 1984 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 98-287.
- Signed by President.
On May 9, 1984 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On May 2, 1984 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- House Receded From its Amendment to title.
On May 2, 1984 in the Senate:
- House Agreed to Senate Amendment to the House amendment to the text of the bill by Voice Vote.
On April 11, 1984 in the Senate:
- Considered by Senate.
- Senate disagreed to the House amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
- Senate concurred with amendment SP2955 to the House amendmentto the text of the bill by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.2955 Amendment SP 2955 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.2955 Proposed by Senator Baker for Senator McClure. To strike section 4.
On March 5, 1984 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On March 1, 1984 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 347.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 98-609.
On February 22, 1984 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 9, 1984 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 15, 1983 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From USDA.
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 4, 1983 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
On April 21, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands and National Parks.
On April 18, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
On April 13, 1983 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
- Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On February 24, 1983 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.2955
To strike section 4.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor