+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On October 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 115-73. (TXT | PDF)
- Signed by President.
On October 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On October 12, 2017 in the House:
- Rule provides for consideration of S. 585 with 1 hour of general debate. Bill is closed to amendments. The resolution provides for proceedings during the period from October 16, 2017, through October 20, 2017; and provides for consideration of motions to suspend the rules.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed by recorded vote: 420 - 0 (Roll no. 568). (text: CR H7989)
- On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 190 - 232 (Roll no. 567).
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8010-8012)
- POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the O'Halleran motion to recommit, the Chair put the question on the motion, and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. O'Halleran demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the motion to recommit until a time to be announced.
- The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
- Mr. O'Halleran moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. (text: CR H8003)
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on S. 585.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 562. (consideration: CR H7998-8004)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the O'Halleran motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House forthwith with an amendment to add a new section at the end of title I related to Disclosure of Violations Relating to Air Transportation.
On October 11, 2017 in the House:
- Rule H. Res. 562 passed House.
On October 10, 2017 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 562 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of S. 585 with 1 hour of general debate. Bill is closed to amendments. The resolution provides for proceedings during the period from October 16, 2017, through October 20, 2017; and provides for consideration of motions to suspend the rules.
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations Discharged.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
- Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.
- Received in the House.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3190; text as passed Senate: CR S3192-3194)
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 57.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 115-44.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor