+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On August 4, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
- Received in the House.
On August 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On August 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.
- The committee amendments agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.746 Amendment SA 746 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.746 Amendment SA 746 proposed by Senator Portman for Senator Johnson. (consideration: CR S4687; text: CR S4690-4694) To permit an Inspector General to withhold certain material from the Office of Special Counsel if the material is derived from, or pertains to, intelligence activities.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4687-4694)
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 93.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 115-74.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
+ − Amendments (2)
SA 746
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
S.Amdt.746
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.