+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely postponed by Senate by Unanimous Consent.
On July 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 225.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 106-117 .
On June 30, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On May 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Department of the Interior, OMB.
On April 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on National Parks, Historic Preservation, and Recreation. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 106-113.
On March 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Parks, Preservation and Recreation.
On March 10, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor