+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On December 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 116-250.
On December 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On December 8, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6988)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 578.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6988-6991)
- Mr. Larson (CT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On December 3, 2020 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
On December 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 3, 2020 in the House:
- Received in the House.
On December 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- S.Amdt.2689 Amendment SA 2689, under the order of 12/01/20, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 48 - 49. Record Vote Number: 249.
- S.Amdt.2689 Amendment SA 2689 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Grassley. (consideration: CR S7157, S7163; text: CR S7182-7183) To increase the overpayment collection threshold for old-age, survivors, and disability insurance benefits.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Senate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7157, S7163-7164)
- Passed Senate, under the order of 12/01/20, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 96 - 1. Record Vote Number: 250. (text: CR S7164)
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
+ − Amendments (2)
SA 2689
To increase the overpayment collection threshold for old-age, survivors, and disability insurance benefits.
S.Amdt.2689
To increase the overpayment collection threshold for old-age, survivors, and disability insurance benefits.
+ − Votes (2)
December 2, 2020: On the Amendment S.Amdt. 2689 to S. 578 (ALS Disability Insurance Access Act of 2019)
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 49
- Absent: 3
Details:
+
−
- Sherrod Brown: nay
- Maria Cantwell: nay
- Benjamin L. Cardin: nay
- Thomas R. Carper: nay
- Robert P. Casey Jr.: nay
- Dianne Feinstein: nay
- Amy Klobuchar: nay
- Robert Menendez: nay
- Bernard Sanders: absent
- Debbie Stabenow: nay
- Jon Tester: nay
- Sheldon Whitehouse: nay
- John Barrasso: yea
- Roger F. Wicker: yea
- Lamar Alexander: yea
- Susan M. Collins: nay
- John Cornyn: yea
- Richard J. Durbin: nay
- Michael B. Enzi: yea
- Lindsey Graham: yea
- James M. Inhofe: yea
- Mitch McConnell: yea
- Jeff Merkley: nay
- Jack Reed: nay
- James E. Risch: yea
- Pat Roberts: yea
- Jeanne Shaheen: nay
- Tom Udall: nay
- Mark R. Warner: nay
- Kirsten E. Gillibrand: nay
- Christopher A. Coons: nay
- Joe Manchin III: nay
- Tammy Baldwin: nay
- Michael F. Bennet: nay
- Marsha Blackburn: yea
- Richard Blumenthal: nay
- Roy Blunt: yea
- John Boozman: yea
- Richard Burr: yea
- Shelley Moore Capito: yea
- Bill Cassidy: yea
- Mike Crapo: yea
- Cory Gardner: yea
- Chuck Grassley: yea
- Martin Heinrich: nay
- Mazie K. Hirono: nay
- John Hoeven: yea
- Ron Johnson: yea
- James Lankford: yea
- Patrick J. Leahy: nay
- Mike Lee: yea
- Edward J. Markey: nay
- Jerry Moran: yea
- Lisa Murkowski: yea
- Christopher Murphy: nay
- Patty Murray: nay
- Rand Paul: yea
- Gary C. Peters: nay
- Rob Portman: yea
- Marco Rubio: yea
- Charles E. Schumer: nay
- Tim Scott: yea
- Richard C. Shelby: yea
- John Thune: yea
- Patrick Toomey: yea
- Chris Van Hollen: nay
- Ron Wyden: nay
- Todd Young: yea
- Brian Schatz: nay
- Tom Cotton: nay
- Kyrsten Sinema: nay
- Tammy Duckworth: nay
- Elizabeth Warren: nay
- Angus S. King Jr.: nay
- Steve Daines: yea
- Kevin Cramer: yea
- Deb Fischer: yea
- Ted Cruz: yea
- Tim Kaine: nay
- Cory A. Booker: nay
- Joni Ernst: yea
- David Perdue: yea
- Mike Rounds: yea
- Ben Sasse: yea
- Dan Sullivan: yea
- Thom Tillis: yea
- Catherine Cortez Masto: nay
- Kamala D. Harris: absent
- Margaret Wood Hassan: nay
- John Kennedy: yea
- Jacky Rosen: nay
- Doug Jones: nay
- Tina Smith: nay
- Cindy Hyde-Smith: yea
- Mike Braun: yea
- Josh Hawley: nay
- Mitt Romney: yea
- Rick Scott: yea
- Kelly Loeffler: absent
December 2, 2020: On Passage of the Bill S. 578
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
Details:
+
−
- Sherrod Brown: yea
- Maria Cantwell: yea
- Benjamin L. Cardin: yea
- Thomas R. Carper: yea
- Robert P. Casey Jr.: yea
- Dianne Feinstein: yea
- Amy Klobuchar: yea
- Robert Menendez: yea
- Bernard Sanders: absent
- Debbie Stabenow: yea
- Jon Tester: yea
- Sheldon Whitehouse: yea
- John Barrasso: yea
- Roger F. Wicker: yea
- Lamar Alexander: yea
- Susan M. Collins: yea
- John Cornyn: yea
- Richard J. Durbin: yea
- Michael B. Enzi: yea
- Lindsey Graham: yea
- James M. Inhofe: yea
- Mitch McConnell: yea
- Jeff Merkley: yea
- Jack Reed: yea
- James E. Risch: yea
- Pat Roberts: yea
- Jeanne Shaheen: yea
- Tom Udall: yea
- Mark R. Warner: yea
- Kirsten E. Gillibrand: yea
- Christopher A. Coons: yea
- Joe Manchin III: yea
- Tammy Baldwin: yea
- Michael F. Bennet: yea
- Marsha Blackburn: yea
- Richard Blumenthal: yea
- Roy Blunt: yea
- John Boozman: yea
- Richard Burr: yea
- Shelley Moore Capito: yea
- Bill Cassidy: yea
- Mike Crapo: yea
- Cory Gardner: yea
- Chuck Grassley: yea
- Martin Heinrich: yea
- Mazie K. Hirono: yea
- John Hoeven: yea
- Ron Johnson: yea
- James Lankford: yea
- Patrick J. Leahy: yea
- Mike Lee: nay
- Edward J. Markey: yea
- Jerry Moran: yea
- Lisa Murkowski: yea
- Christopher Murphy: yea
- Patty Murray: yea
- Rand Paul: yea
- Gary C. Peters: yea
- Rob Portman: yea
- Marco Rubio: yea
- Charles E. Schumer: yea
- Tim Scott: yea
- Richard C. Shelby: yea
- John Thune: yea
- Patrick Toomey: yea
- Chris Van Hollen: yea
- Ron Wyden: yea
- Todd Young: yea
- Brian Schatz: yea
- Tom Cotton: yea
- Kyrsten Sinema: yea
- Tammy Duckworth: yea
- Elizabeth Warren: yea
- Angus S. King Jr.: yea
- Steve Daines: yea
- Kevin Cramer: yea
- Deb Fischer: yea
- Ted Cruz: yea
- Tim Kaine: yea
- Cory A. Booker: yea
- Joni Ernst: yea
- David Perdue: yea
- Mike Rounds: yea
- Ben Sasse: yea
- Dan Sullivan: yea
- Thom Tillis: yea
- Catherine Cortez Masto: yea
- Kamala D. Harris: absent
- Margaret Wood Hassan: yea
- John Kennedy: yea
- Jacky Rosen: yea
- Doug Jones: yea
- Tina Smith: yea
- Cindy Hyde-Smith: yea
- Mike Braun: yea
- Josh Hawley: yea
- Mitt Romney: yea
- Rick Scott: yea
- Kelly Loeffler: absent
+ − Sponsors (68)
Type:
Primary Sponsor