+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On October 17, 1975 in the Senate:
- Public law 94-115.
- Signed by President.
On October 7, 1975 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On October 7, 1975 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On October 6, 1975 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- Measure passed House in lieu of H.R. 4804 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in House.
On May 22, 1975 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
On May 21, 1975 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On May 20, 1975 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs with amendment, S. Rept. 94-147.
On February 5, 1975 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor