+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On December 19, 1980 in the House:
- Private Law 96-89.
- Signed by President.
On December 9, 1980 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On December 5, 1980 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- Measure passed House.
On December 2, 1980 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the Judiciary, H. Rept. 96-1489.
On March 24, 1980 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the Judiciary.
On March 20, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
On March 18, 1980 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary with amendment, S. Rept. 96-638.
On March 5, 1979 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor