+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On July 11, 1995 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 138.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 104-105 .
On June 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On May 18, 1995 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Energy Production and Regulation. Hearings held.
On April 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources received executive comment from Federal Energy Regulatory Commission.
On March 15, 1995 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources received executive comment from Federal Energy Regulatory Commission.
On March 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Energy Production and Regulation.
On March 13, 1995 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor