+ − Summary
+ − Actions (6)
On July 16, 1986 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered favorably reported H.R. 1343 in lieu of this measure.
On February 21, 1986 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Public Lands and Reserved Water. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 99-532, PT. 2.
On July 9, 1985 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources received executive comment from Interior Department. Favorable.
On April 19, 1985 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Interior Department, OMB.
On February 27, 1985 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands and Reserved Water.
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor