+ − Summary
+ − Actions (9)
On June 25, 1984 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
On June 21, 1984 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On June 14, 1984 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 989.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond without amendment. With written report No. 98-517.
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On June 12, 1984 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Immigration and Refugee Policy. Approved for full committee consideration without amendment favorably.
On November 15, 1983 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Immigration and Refugee Policy. Approved for full committee consideration without amendment favorably.
On February 18, 1983 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Immigration and Refugee Policy.
On February 17, 1983 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor