+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On September 4, 1980 in the Senate:
- Public Law 96-336.
- Signed by President.
On August 26, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On August 25, 1980 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On August 21, 1980 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- House agreed to Senate amendments.
On June 24, 1980 in the House:
- Senate agreed to House amendment with an amendment.
On February 7, 1980 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H. R. 2609 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by special rule in House.
On June 4, 1979 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On May 15, 1979 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources with amendment, S. Rept. 96-181.
On February 26, 1979 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor