+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On July 21, 1993 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered favorably reported H.R. 873 in lieu of this measure.
On May 6, 1993 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks. Hearings held.
On April 15, 1993 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Department of Agriculture, Department of the Interior, and Office of Management and Budget.
On March 9, 1993 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Department of Agriculture, Department of the Interior, and Office of Management and Budget.
On March 4, 1993 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks.
On March 3, 1993 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor