+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On December 18, 2020 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
On December 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7640-7641)
- S.Amdt.2714 Amendment SA 2714 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.2714 Amendment SA 2714 proposed by Senator Braun for Senator Klobuchar. (consideration: CR S7640-7641; text: CR S7640-7641) In the nature of a substitute.
- The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (CR S7640)
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7639-7641)
On September 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 524.
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-261.
On November 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
+ − Amendments (2)
SA 2714
In the nature of a substitute.
S.Amdt.2714
In the nature of a substitute.