+ − Actions (13)
On December 1, 1981 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Mines and Mining.
On November 4, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
On November 2, 1981 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
On October 22, 1981 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 339.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator McClure favorably with an amendment. With written report No. 97-245.
On September 30, 1981 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
On September 17, 1981 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. Hearings held.
On September 16, 1981 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Interior Department; OMB.
On February 16, 1981 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
On February 6, 1981 in the Senate:
- Read second time and referred to Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor