+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On November 15, 1990 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 101-580.
- Signed by President.
On November 9, 1990 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 26, 1990 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- A similar measure H.R. 2946 was laid on the table without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- Mr. Kastenmeier asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
- Committee on Judiciary discharged.
On May 4, 1990 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Administration of Justice.
On May 3, 1990 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
- Received in the House.
On May 3, 1990 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On May 1, 1990 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
On April 19, 1990 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 510.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 101-266.
On March 22, 1990 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On July 26, 1989 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Patents, Copyrights and Trademarks. Approved for full committee consideration with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On March 13, 1989 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Patents, Copyrights and Trademarks.
On February 28, 1989 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor