+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 116-112. (TXT | PDF)
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H198)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 457.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H198-201)
- Ms. Waters moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On December 17, 2019 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
On December 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.1257 Amendment SA 1257 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.1257 Amendment SA 1257 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Cornyn. (consideration: CR S7058; text: CR S7058) In the nature of a substitute.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7058)
- Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
+ − Amendments (2)
SA 1257
In the nature of a substitute.
S.Amdt.1257
In the nature of a substitute.
+ − Sponsors (67)
Type:
Primary Sponsor