+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On December 9, 1999 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 106-163.
- Signed by President.
On November 30, 1999 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On November 18, 1999 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- Mr. Young asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
On November 5, 1999 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On November 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- S.AMDT.2512 Proposed by Senator Grassley for Senator Burns. To provide for a complete substitute.
- S.AMDT.2512 Amendment SP 2512 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On October 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- By Senator Campbell from Committee on Indian Affairs filed written report. Report No. 106-200 .
On September 30, 1999 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 297.
- Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged. Pursuant to the order of May 27, 1999.
On July 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources pursuant to the order of May 27, 1999, for a period not to exceed 60 calendar days.
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Campbell without amendment. Without written report.
On June 30, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 106-119.
On May 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs with instructions that at such time as the Committee on Indian Affairs reports the measure, it be referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources for a period not to exceed 60 calendar days and that if the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources has not reported the measure prior to the expiration of the 60 calendar day period, the Energy Committee be discharged from further consideration of the measure and that the measure be then placed on the calendar.
- Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On February 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Water and Power.
On February 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.2512
To provide for a complete substitute.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor