+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On July 17, 1987 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 243.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 100-115. Additional views filed.
On May 19, 1987 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On February 26, 1987 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Antitrust, Monopolies and Business. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 100-46.
On February 13, 1987 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Antitrust, Monopolies and Business.
On February 2, 1987 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor