+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 117-10.
- Signed by President.
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H1873-1874)
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H1873-1874)
- Ms. Scanlon asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
- Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H1873-1874)
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S868-869; text: CR S868-869)
- Passed/agreed to in Senate: Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S868-869; text: CR S868-869)
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor