+ − Actions (19)
On March 12, 1981 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely postponed by Senate by Voice Vote.
- Senate incorporated this measure in H.R. 31 as an amendment.
- Considered by Senate.
- S.UP.AMDT.10 Amendment agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.UP.AMDT.9 Amendment not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 41-56. Record Vote No: 28.
- S.UP.AMDT.10 Proposed by Senator Helms. Permitting the nomination of a Surgeon General who may be more than 64 years old.
- S.UP.AMDT.9 Proposed by Senator Proxmire. To permit surcharges.
On March 5, 1981 in the Senate:
- Considered by Senate.
On February 27, 1981 in the Senate:
- Committee on Banking. Reported to Senate by Senator Garn favorably with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 97-23.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 28.
On February 26, 1981 in the Senate:
- Committee on Banking. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On February 25, 1981 in the Senate:
- Committee on Banking received executive comment from Federal Home Loan Bank Board.
On February 23, 1981 in the Senate:
- Committee on Banking received executive comment from National Credit Union Administration. Favorable.
On February 18, 1981 in the Senate:
- Committee on Banking received executive comment from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Favorable.
- Subcommittee on Consumer Affairs. Hearings held.
On February 10, 1981 in the Senate:
- Committee on Banking requested executive comment from National Credit Union Administration; Federal Trade Commission; Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
- Committee on Banking requested executive comment from Federal Reserve System; Federal Home Loan Bank Board; Office of the Comptroller of the Currency.
On February 5, 1981 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Subcommittee on Consumer Affairs.
- Read second time and referred to Senate Committee on Banking.
+ − Amendments (2)
S.UP.AMDT.10
Permitting the nomination of a Surgeon General who may be more than 64 years old.
S.UP.AMDT.9
To permit surcharges.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor