+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 27, 2012 in the House:
- Presented to President.
- Signed by President.
On June 20, 2012 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On June 18, 2012 in the House:
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 380 - 0 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 404 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Hastings moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 300.
On April 16, 2012 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-433 .
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Discharged.
On October 24, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
On October 21, 2011 in the House:
- Received in the House.
On October 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On October 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 136.
On August 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/02/2011 without amendment. With written report No. 112-56 .
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On July 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 112-124.
On May 11, 2011 in the Senate:
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor