+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On October 2, 1985 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Provisions of measure incorporated into measure S. 426 ordered to be reported.
On July 31, 1985 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Committee consideration and Mark Up Session held.
On June 11, 1985 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 99-236.
On May 23, 1985 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources received executive comment from Federal Energy Regulatory Commission. Favorable.
On April 17, 1985 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Energy Department , OMB.
On February 6, 1985 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Water and Power.
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor