+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On November 6, 1986 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 99-614.
- Signed by President.
On October 30, 1986 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On October 29, 1986 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 18, 1986 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Senate agreed to the House amendments by Voice Vote.
On October 15, 1986 in the House:
- Message on House action received in Senate and held at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- H.AMDT.1301 Amendment Passed in Committee of the Whole by Voice Vote.
- H.AMDT.1301 Amendment Offered by Representative Seiberling. An amendment that provides a declaration of abandonment of the described lands.
On February 24, 1986 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Interior.
On February 20, 1986 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands.
On February 6, 1986 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
On February 4, 1986 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On November 26, 1985 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 439.
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Roth under the authority of the order of Nov 23, 85 without amendment. Without written report.
On November 22, 1985 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Approved for reporting without amendment favorably.
On October 9, 1985 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Civil Service and General Services. Approved for full committee consideration without amendment favorably.
On February 27, 1985 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs requested executive comment from OMB.
On February 22, 1985 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs requested executive comment from OMB.
On February 19, 1985 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Civil Service and General Services.
On February 5, 1985 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.1301
An amendment that provides a declaration of abandonment of the described lands.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor