+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On September 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 282.
- Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator Lott for Senator McCain with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 106-162 .
On June 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On March 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 106-845.
On February 6, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On February 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor