+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (51)
On March 17, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Presented to President.
On March 10, 2000 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On March 9, 2000 in the House:
- Motions to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On agreeing to the conference report Agreed to by voice vote.
- The previous question was ordered without objection.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on the conference report on S. 376 .
- Mr. Bliley brought up conference report H. Rept. 106-509 for consideration as a privileged matter.
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 432 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of the conference report to S. 376 . All points of order against the conference report and against its consideration are waived.
On March 8, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On March 6, 2000 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference report by Unanimous Consent.
On March 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- Conference papers: Senate report and manager's statement and official papers held at the desk in Senate.
- Conferees agreed to file conference report.
- Conference report H. Rept. 106-509 filed.
- Conference held.
On February 29, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On January 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to request for conference. Appointed conferees. McCain, Stevens, Burns, Hollings and Inouye.
On January 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Senate disagreed to the House amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate withdrew request of November 19, 1999, for conference by Unanimous Consent Vote.
- Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: and the House requests that the Senate withdraw its request for a conference and agree to the conference asked by the House.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- Senate requests a conference. Appoints conferees. McCain; Stevens; Burns; Hollings; Inouye. by Unanimous Consent.
On November 19, 1999 in the House:
- Senate disagreed to the House amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
On November 16, 1999 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On November 10, 1999 in the House:
- The House struck all after the enacting clause and inserted in lieu thereof the provisions of a similar measure H.R. 3261 . Agreed to without objection.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Telecommunications, Trade, and Consumer Protection.
- Committee on Commerce discharged.
- Mr. Tauzin asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- The Speaker appointed conferees: Bliley, Tauzin, Oxley, Dingell, and Markey.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- A similar measure H.R. 3261 was laid on the table without objection.
- Mr. Tauzin asked unanimous consent that the House insist upon its amendment, and request a conference.
- On motion that the House insist upon its amendment, and request a conference Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On August 27, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Commerce.
On July 12, 1999 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On July 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On July 1, 1999 in the Senate:
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 189.
- S.AMDT.1221 Amendment SP 1221 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.1221 Proposed by Senator Burns. To prohibit INTELSAT from entering the United States market directly to provide any satellite communications services or space segment capacity to carriers or end users in the United States until July 1, 2001 or until INTELSAT achieves a pro-competitive privatization pursuant to section 613 of privatization occurs earlier.
- The committee substitute as amended agreed to.
On June 30, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator McCain with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 106-100 .
- Committee on Commerce. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On May 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation Subcommittee on Communications. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 106-1099.
On March 25, 1999 in the Senate:
On February 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.1221
To prohibit INTELSAT from entering the United States market directly to provide any satellite communications services or space segment capacity to carriers (other than the United States signatory) or end users in the United States until July 1, 2001 or until INTELSAT achieves a pro-competitive privatization pursuant to section 613 (a) of privatization occurs earlier.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor