+ − Actions (8)
On November 29, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
On October 1, 1982 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
On September 29, 1982 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 889.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond with an amendment. With written report No. 97-609.
On September 28, 1982 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
On September 15, 1982 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Immigration and Refugee Policy. Approved for full committee consideration with an amendment favorably.
On February 5, 1981 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Immigration and Refugee Policy.
On February 3, 1981 in the Senate:
- Read second time and referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor